VT H0577 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on 5/9/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on 5/9/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Public Water Systems
Title
An Act Relating To Public Water Systems
Sponsors
Rep. David Deen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-05 | Signed by Governor on 5/9/2012 | |
2012-05-01 | Rules suspended & action messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-05-05 | Delivered to the Governor on 5/9/2012 | |
2012-05-04 | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment | |
2012-05-01 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-05-01 | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in | |
2012-05-02 | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton | |
2012-04-30 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2012-04-30 | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy agreed to | |
2012-04-30 | Reported favorably by Senator Nitka for Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-04-30 | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Brock for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy | |
2012-04-30 | Consideration Postponed/Second Reading | |
2012-04-28 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-27 | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-04-27 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy | |
2012-04-27 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-04-17 | Committed to Committee on Appropriations with report of Committee on Natural Resources and Energy intact, under suspension of Senate Rule 49, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-04-17 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-16 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy | |
2012-04-16 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-03-02 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy | |
2012-02-29 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2012-02-28 | Amendment of Committee on Fish, Wildlife & Water Resources agreed to and Third Reading Ordered | |
2012-02-28 | Amendment of Committee on Corrections and Institutions agreed to | |
2012-02-28 | Rep. Rep. Shaw of Pittsford, recommended for the committee on Corrections and Institutions | |
2012-02-28 | Rep. Rep. Fagan of Rutland City reported for the committee on Fish, Wildlife & Water Resources | |
2012-02-28 | Read Second Time | |
2012-02-24 | Action Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Fagan of Rutland City | |
2012-02-17 | Committed to Committee on Corrections and Institutions by motion of Rep. Heath of Westford | |
2012-02-14 | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) | |
2012-01-20 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Fish, Wildlife & Water Resources |