VT H0575 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-20 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-20 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Lottery Ticket Sales
Title
An Act Relating To Lottery Ticket Sales
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2014-03-19 | House | Passed |
2014-03-19 | House | Read Third time |
2014-03-18 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2014-03-18 | House | Amendment of Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs agreed to |
2014-03-18 | House | Rep. Stevens of Waterbury reported for the committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs |
2014-03-18 | House | Read Second Time |
2014-01-09 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs |