VT H0571 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Signed by Governor on 5/31/16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Signed by Governor on 5/31/16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to driver’s license suspensions and judicial, criminal justice, and insurance topics
Title
An act relating to driver’s license suspensions and judicial, criminal justice, and insurance topics
Sponsors
Rep. Maxine Grad [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-29 - Senate - Motion to amend disagreed to on roll call, requested by Senator Benning, Failed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 14, Nays = 15 (Y: 14 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-03-16 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 143 to Pass -- Yeas = 128, Nays = 15 (Y: 128 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 143 to Pass -- Yeas = 128, Nays = 15 (Y: 128 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-31 | House | Signed by Governor on 5/31/16 |
2016-05-31 | House | Delivered to the Governor on 5/31/16 |
2016-05-06 | Senate | House message House adopted Conference Committee report |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Committee of Conference report adopted |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Sears for Committee, text |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Committee of Conference Report |
2016-05-06 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2016-05-06 | House | Committee of Conference report agreed to (House bill) |
2016-05-06 | House | Which was agreed to |
2016-05-06 | House | Rep. Turner of Milton moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Sears, Nitka, and Flory |
2016-05-04 | Senate | House message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed |
2016-05-03 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2016-05-03 | House | Speaker appointed Conquest of Newbury, Jewett of Ripton and Canfield of Fair Haven as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2016-05-03 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. Conquest of Newbury |
2016-05-03 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2016-05-02 | House | Senate message passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment disagreed to |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Riehle and Sirotkin motion to amend proposal of amendment; text |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Point of order on ground of lack of germaneness raised by Senator Rodgers sustained |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Lyons motion to amend proposal of amendment; text |
2016-04-29 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Motion to amend disagreed to on roll call, requested by Senator Benning, Failed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 14, Nays = 15 |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senator Lyons moved to strike out Secs. 19-21 of amendment of the Committee on Judiciary |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Cummings; text |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Sears for Committee on Appropriations |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Lyons for Committee on Finance |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Pending third reading motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Lyons |
2016-05-02 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Cummings |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Cummings |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2016-04-28 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Rules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Appropriations with the report of Committee on Judiciary and Committee on Finance intact, on motion of Senator Campbell |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-03-16 | House | Passed |
2016-03-16 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 143 to Pass -- Yeas = 128, Nays = 15 |
2016-03-16 | House | Read Third time |
2016-03-16 | House | Rep. Dame of Essex asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment |
2016-03-16 | House | Rep. Dame of Essex moved to amend the bill |
2016-03-15 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2016-03-15 | House | Report of Committee on Judiciary agreed to. |
2016-03-15 | House | Rep. Donovan of Burlington reported for the committee on Ways & Means |
2016-03-15 | House | Rep. Conquest of Newbury reported for the committee on Judiciary |
2016-03-15 | House | Read Second Time |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways & Means per Rule 35(a) |
2016-03-09 | House | Action Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Conquest of Newbury |
2016-01-15 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary |