VT H0565 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-20 - Signed by Governor on 4/20/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-20 - Signed by Governor on 4/20/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Regulating Licensed Lenders And Mortgage Loan Originators
Title
An Act Relating To Regulating Licensed Lenders And Mortgage Loan Originators
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-20 | Signed by Governor on 4/20/2012 | |
2012-04-17 | Delivered to the Governor on 4/17/2012 | |
2012-04-12 | Passed the House and Senate on 4/11/2012 | |
2012-04-11 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-04-11 | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence | |
2012-04-11 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2012-04-10 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-10 | Reported favorably by Senator Cummings for Committee on Finance, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered | |
2012-04-06 | Favorable report by Committee on Finance | |
2012-04-06 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-02-16 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance | |
2012-02-10 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2012-02-09 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2012-02-09 | Amendment of Committee on Commerce and Economic Development agreed to | |
2012-02-09 | Rep. Young of Glover spoke for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development | |
2012-02-09 | Read Second Time | |
2012-01-19 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development |