VT H0555 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on May 28, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on May 28, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To The Commitment Of A Criminal Defendant Who Is Incompetent To Stand Trial Because Of A Traumatic Brain Injury
Title
An Act Relating To The Commitment Of A Criminal Defendant Who Is Incompetent To Stand Trial Because Of A Traumatic Brain Injury
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor on May 28, 2014 |
2014-05-09 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2014-05-07 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2014-05-07 | House | Rep. Turner of Milton moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2014-05-06 | House | Senate message passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2014-05-03 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2014-05-02 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Nitka for Committee on Appropriations |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Nitka for Committee on Judiciary |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2014-05-02 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-03-27 | House | Passed |
2014-03-27 | House | Read Third time |
2014-03-27 | House | Which was agreed to |
2014-03-27 | House | Rep. Donahue of Northfield, Trieber of Rockingham, Batchelor of Derby, Burditt of West Rutland, Frank of Underhill, French of Randolph, Haas of Rochester, Krowinski of Burlington, McFaun of Barre Town, Mrowicki of Putney, and Pugh of South Burlington moved to amend the bill |
2014-03-26 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2014-03-26 | House | Amendment of Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2014-03-26 | House | Report of the Committee on Judiciary amended as recommended by the Committee on Appropriations |
2014-03-26 | House | Rep. Manwaring of Wilmington reported for the committee on Appropriations |
2014-03-26 | House | Rep. Koch of Barre Town reported for the committee on Judiciary |
2014-03-26 | House | Read Second Time |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2014-01-07 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary |