VT H0550 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-27 - Signed by Governor on 4/27/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-27 - Signed by Governor on 4/27/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To The Vermont Administrative Procedure Act
Title
An Act Relating To The Vermont Administrative Procedure Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-27 | Signed by Governor on 4/27/2012 | |
2012-04-26 | Delivered to the Governor on 4/26/2012 | |
2012-04-25 | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment | |
2012-04-24 | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in | |
2012-04-20 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-04-20 | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment | |
2012-04-20 | Unfinished Business/Third Reading | |
2012-04-19 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2012-04-19 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2012-04-19 | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to | |
2012-04-19 | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Government Operations | |
2012-04-18 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-17 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-16 | Revised Recommendation of amendment of Committee on Government Operations | |
2012-04-16 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations | |
2012-04-16 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-04-13 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-12 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations | |
2012-04-12 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-03-23 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations | |
2012-03-21 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2012-03-20 | Amendment of Committee on Government Operations agreed to and Third Reading Ordered | |
2012-03-20 | Rep. Townsend of Randolph reported for the committee on Government Operations | |
2012-03-20 | Read Second Time | |
2012-01-17 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |