VT H0534 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to retail theft
Title
An act relating to retail theft
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2024-04-23 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-03-14 | House | Read third time and passed |
2024-03-14 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2024-03-13 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2024-03-13 | House | Second division of amendment agreed to |
2024-03-13 | House | First division of amendment agreed to |
2024-03-13 | House | Rep. Cina of Burlington asked that the question be divided |
2024-03-13 | House | Rep. Notte of Rutland City reported for the Committee on Judiciary |
2024-03-13 | House | Read second time |
2024-03-13 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-03-12 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2024-01-03 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary |