VT H0534 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 30, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 30, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to approval of the adoption and codification of the charter of the Town of Calais
Title
An act relating to approval of the adoption and codification of the charter of the Town of Calais
Sponsors
Rep. Janet Ancel [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on May 30, 2017 |
2017-05-30 | House | Signed by Governor on May 30, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 24, 2017 |
2017-05-04 | House | Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Mazza |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Collamore for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Mazza |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Government Operations per Temporary Senate Rule 44A |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-04-28 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2017-04-28 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2017-04-27 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2017-04-27 | House | Report of Committee on Government Operations agreed to. |
2017-04-27 | House | Rep. Lewis of Berlin reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2017-04-27 | House | Read Second Time |
2017-04-27 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2017-04-13 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |