VT H0533 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 20, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to workforce development

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to workforce development

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on June 20, 2019
2019-06-20HouseSigned by Governor on June 20, 2019
2019-06-19HouseDelivered to the Governor on June 19, 2019
2019-05-24HouseSenate message, report of committee of conference adopted
2019-05-24SenateHouse message House adopted Conference Committee report
2019-05-24HouseRules Suspended and Action on the bill messaged to the Senate forthwith and the bill delivered to the Governor forthwith as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney.
2019-05-24HouseCommittee of Conference report adopted (House bill)
2019-05-24HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2019-05-24HouseSenate message, report of committee of conference adopted
2019-05-24SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2019-05-24SenateCommittee of Conference report adopted on roll call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 14 of 27 to Pass -- Yeas = 24, Nays = 3
2019-05-24SenateCommittee of Conference report submitted by Senator Sirotkin for Committee, text
2019-05-24SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe
2019-05-10SenateRules suspended & action messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2019-05-10SenateCommittee of Conference appointed: Senators Sirotkin, Clarkson, and Brock
2019-05-10SenateHouse message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed
2019-05-10HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2019-05-10HouseSpeaker appointed Marcotte of Coventry, Kimbell of Woodstock and O'Sullivan of Burlington as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House
2019-05-10HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. O'Sullivan of Burlington
2019-05-10HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2019-05-10HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2019-05-10SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2019-05-10SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2019-05-10SenateProposal of amendment agreed to
2019-05-10SenatePending third reading, Senator(s) Sirotkin motion to amend proposal of amendment; text
2019-05-10SenateProposal of amendment not agreed to
2019-05-10SenatePending third reading, Senator(s) Rodgers motion to amend proposal of amendment; text
2019-05-10SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2019-05-09Senate3rd reading ordered
2019-05-09SenateProposal of amendment  by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs, as amended, agreed to
2019-05-09SenateMotion disagreed to
2019-05-09SenateSenator Pollina moved to strike out Sec 11 of the proposal of amendment of Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2019-05-09SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-09SenateReported favorably by Senator Starr for Committee on Appropriations with proposal of amendment
2019-05-09SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Clarkson for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2019-05-09SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-09SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2019-05-09SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2019-05-08SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-08SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2019-05-08SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-05-02SenateRules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Appropriations with the report of Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs intact
2019-05-02SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Sirotkin
2019-03-29SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2019-03-27HousePassed
2019-03-27HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 63 of 124 to Pass -- Yeas = 124, Nays = 0
2019-03-27HouseRead Third time
2019-03-27HouseWhich was agreed to
2019-03-27HouseRep. Shaw of Pittsford moved to amend the bill
2019-03-26HouseThird Reading Ordered
2019-03-26HouseWhich was agreed to
2019-03-26HouseRep. Marcotte of Coventry moved to amend the bill
2019-03-26HouseRep. Myers of Essex recommended for the committee on Appropriations
2019-03-26HouseRep. Marcotte of Coventry spoke for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development
2019-03-26HouseRead Second Time
2019-03-19HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
2019-03-19HouseCommittee Bill read first time

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback