VT H0526 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Signed by Governor on May 22, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Signed by Governor on May 22, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to regulating notaries public
Title
An act relating to regulating notaries public
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | House | Signed by Governor on May 22, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-09 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2018-05-09 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-09 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2018-05-09 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-05-08 | Senate | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment |
2018-05-08 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2018-05-08 | House | Which was agreed to |
2018-05-08 | House | Rep. Townsend of South Burlington moved that the House concur in the Senate proposal of amendment with a further amendment thereto |
2018-05-08 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment considered |
2018-05-04 | House | Action postponed until May 8, 2018 as moved by Rep. Townsend of South Burlington |
2018-05-02 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-05-02 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Sirotkin for Committee on Finance |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Pearson for Committee on Government Operations |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2018-05-01 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Government Operations per Temporary Senate Rule 44A |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules |
2017-04-21 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2017-04-20 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2017-04-20 | House | Rep. Browning of Arlington recommended for the committee on Ways and Means |
2017-04-20 | House | Rep. Hubert of Milton spoke for the committee on Government Operations |
2017-04-20 | House | Read Second Time |
2017-04-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2017-04-11 | House | Committee Bill read first time |