VT H0525 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Third Reading Ordered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to miscellaneous agricultural subjects

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to miscellaneous agricultural subjects

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21HouseThird Reading Ordered
2019-03-21HouseWhich was agreed to
2019-03-21HouseRep. Emmons of Springfield moved to amend the bill
2019-03-21HouseRep. Graham of Williamstown spoke for the committee on Agriculture and Forestry
2019-03-21HouseRead Second Time
2019-03-20HouseAction Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Graham of Williamstown
2019-03-19HouseCommittee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on March 19, 2019

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback