VT H0523 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Text of Governor's message
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Text of Governor's message
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to reducing hydrofluorocarbon emissions
Title
An act relating to reducing hydrofluorocarbon emissions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | Text of Governor's message |
2022-05-12 | Senate | House message: Governor allowed to become law without signature on May 19, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | House | Allowed to become law without the signature of the Governor on May 19, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 13, 2022 |
2022-05-09 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-05-05 | House | Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2022-05-05 | House | Action Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-05-04 | House | Notice Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-05-03 | House | Senate Message, passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2022-05-02 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2022-04-29 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy agreed to |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator McCormack for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2022-04-29 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2022-03-16 | House | Read Third time and passed |
2022-03-16 | House | Amendment as offered by Rep. Shaw of Pittsford agreed to |
2022-03-16 | House | Action Calendar: Amendment offered by Rep Shaw of Pittsford |
2022-03-16 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2022-03-15 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2022-03-15 | House | Report of Committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife agreed to |
2022-03-15 | House | Rep. Morris of Springfield reported for the Committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife |
2022-03-15 | House | Read Second time |
2022-03-15 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-03-11 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-01-07 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife |