VT H0518 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Veto of the Governor sustained, by a vote of Yeas = 84, Nays = 55
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to making appropriations for the support of government

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to making appropriations for the support of government

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-21 - House - Veto of the Governor sustained, by a vote of Yeas = 84, Nays = 55 (Y: 84 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2017-06-21 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 93 of 139 to Pass -- Yeas = 84, Nays = 55 (Y: 84 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2017-05-18 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 97, Nays = 41 (Y: 97 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Committee of Conference report adopted on roll call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 22, Nays = 6 (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 143, Nays = 1 (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-21HouseVeto of the Governor sustained, by a vote of Yeas = 84, Nays = 55
2017-06-21HouseRoll Call Results Failed -- Needed 93 of 139 to Pass -- Yeas = 84, Nays = 55
2017-06-21HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2017-05-06SenateHouse message: Governor vetoed bill on May 6, 2017
2017-05-22HouseVetoed by the Governor on June 6, 2017
2017-06-02HouseBill Requested by Governor, Delivered on June 2, 2017
2017-05-18SenateHouse message House adopted Conference Committee report
2017-05-18HouseRules Suspended and Action on the bill messaged to the Senate forthwith and the bill delivered to the Governor forthwith as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton.
2017-05-18HouseCommittee of Conference report adopted (House bill)
2017-05-18HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 97, Nays = 41
2017-05-18HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2017-05-18SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2017-05-18SenateCommittee of Conference report adopted on roll call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 22, Nays = 6
2017-05-18SenateCommittee of Conference report submitted by Senator Kitchel for Committee, text
2017-05-18SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Kitchel
2017-04-28SenateCommittee of Conference appointed: Senators Kitchel, Sears, and Westman
2017-04-28SenateHouse message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed
2017-04-27HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
2017-04-27HouseSpeaker appointed Toll of Danville, Fagan of Rutland City and Hooper of Montpelier as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House
2017-04-27HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. Toll of Danville
2017-04-27HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2017-04-27HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2017-04-27SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2017-04-27SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2017-04-27SenateProposal of amendment agreed to
2017-04-27SenateProposal of amendment by Senator(s) Kitchel; text
2017-04-27SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2017-04-26Senate3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0
2017-04-26SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations agreed to
2017-04-26SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations
2017-04-26SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2017-04-26SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2017-04-25SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2017-04-25SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2017-04-24SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2017-04-05SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Appropriations
2017-03-31HousePassed
2017-03-31HouseRead Third time
2017-03-31HouseWhich was disagreed to
2017-03-31HouseRep. Chesnut-Tangerman of Middletown Springs moved to amend the bill
2017-03-31HouseWhich was agreed to
2017-03-31HouseRep. Donovan of Burlington moved to amend the bill
2017-03-31HouseWhich was agreed to
2017-03-31HouseRep. Till of Jericho moved to amend the bill
2017-03-31HouseWhich was disagreed to
2017-03-31HouseRep. Gonzalez of Winooski moved to amend the bill
2017-03-31HouseWhich was agreed to
2017-03-31HouseRep. Hooper of Montpelier moved to amend the bill
2017-03-31HouseWhich was agreed to
2017-03-31HouseRep. Toll of Danville moved to amend the bill
2017-03-31HouseRep. Greshin of Warren asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment
2017-03-31HouseRep. Higley of Lowell moved to amend the bill
2017-03-30HouseThird Reading Ordered
2017-03-30HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 143, Nays = 1
2017-03-30HouseRep. Scheuermann of Stowe moved to amend the bill which was disagreed to
2017-03-30HouseRep. Toll of Danville recommended for the committee on Appropriations
2017-03-30HouseRead Second Time
2017-03-28HouseCommittee Bill read first time

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback