VT H0518 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-09 - Senate Message, Governor veto sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to the membership of the Clean Water Fund Board

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to the membership of the Clean Water Fund Board

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-09 - Senate - Veto of the Governor sustained on a roll call Yeas = 4, Nays = 18 (Y: 4 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2016-06-09 - House - Veto of the Governor overriden by a vote of Yeas = 103, Nays = 10 (Y: 103 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 36) [FAIL]
2016-06-09 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 76 of 113 to Pass -- Yeas = 103, Nays = 10 (Y: 103 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 36) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-09HouseSenate Message, Governor veto sustained
2016-06-09SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell
2016-06-09SenateVeto of the Governor sustained on a roll call Yeas = 4, Nays = 18
2016-06-09SenateText of Governor's message
2016-06-09SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Bray
2016-06-09SenateHouse Message: Bill passed, the veto of the Governor notwithstanding
2016-06-09HouseVeto of the Governor overriden by a vote of Yeas = 103, Nays = 10
2016-06-09HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 76 of 113 to Pass -- Yeas = 103, Nays = 10
2016-05-06HouseVetoed by the Governor on 5/20/2016
2016-05-16HouseDelivered to the Governor on 5/16/16
2016-05-05SenateHouse message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
2016-05-03HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
2016-05-03HouseSenate proposal of amendment considered
2016-05-03HouseWhich was agreed to
2016-05-03HouseRep. Turner of Milton moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration
2016-05-02HouseSenate message passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2016-05-02SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell
2016-05-02SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2016-05-02SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2016-04-29Senate3rd reading ordered
2016-04-29SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy agreed to
2016-04-29SenateReported favorably by Senator Nitka for Committee on Appropriations
2016-04-29SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Riehle for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2016-04-29SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2016-04-29SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2016-04-29SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2016-04-28SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2016-04-28SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2016-04-28SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2016-04-20SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2016-04-20SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources & Energy
2016-04-20SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2016-03-23SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources & Energy
2016-03-18HouseRead Third time and Passed
2016-03-17HouseThird Reading Ordered
2016-03-17HouseReport of Committee on Fish, Wildlife & Water Resources agreed to.
2016-03-17HouseRep. Toll of Danville reported for the committee on Appropriations
2016-03-17HouseRep. Sheldon of Middlebury reported for the committee on Fish, Wildlife & Water Resources
2016-03-17HouseRead Second Time
2016-02-03HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
2016-01-06HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Fish, Wildlife & Water Resources

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback