VT H0517 | 2023-2024 | Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 1, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to approval of the dissolution of Duxbury-Moretown Fire District No. 1 and to deputy State's Attorneys

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to approval of the dissolution of Duxbury-Moretown Fire District No. 1 and to deputy State's Attorneys

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-12SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on June 1, 2023
2023-05-12HouseSigned by Governor on June 1, 2023
2023-05-12HouseDelivered to the Governor on May 26, 2023
2023-05-12SenateHouse message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
2023-05-12HouseBill ordered delivered to the Governor forthwith per Joint Rule 15 as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2023-05-12HouseSenate proposal of amendment concurred in
2023-05-12HouseWhich was agreed to
2023-05-12HouseRep. McCoy of Poultney moved to suspend rules to permit immediate consideration of the bill, pending its entry on the Notice Calendar
2023-05-12HouseSenate Message: Passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2023-05-12SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth
2023-05-12SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2023-05-12SenateRules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Baruth
2023-05-12Senate3rd reading ordered
2023-05-12SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to
2023-05-12SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Watson for Committee on Government Operations
2023-05-12SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Clarkson
2023-05-12SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations
2023-05-12SenateRules suspended and bill not to be referred to Rules per Temporary Rule 44a, and sent to Committee of Jurisdiction
2023-05-12SenateRules suspended on motion of Senator Baruth
2023-05-11HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2023-05-11HouseRead third time and passed
2023-05-11HouseRules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2023-05-11HouseThird Reading ordered
2023-05-11HouseReport of Committee on Government Operations and Military Affairs agreed to
2023-05-11HouseRep. Branagan of Georgia recommended for the Committee on Ways and Means
2023-05-11HouseRep. Higley of Lowell reported for the Committee on Government Operations and Military Affairs
2023-05-11HouseRead second time
2023-05-11HouseWhich was agreed to
2023-05-11HouseRep. McCoy of Poultney moved to suspend rules to permit immediate consideration of the bill, pending its entry on the Notice Calendar
2023-05-10HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
2023-04-19HouseRead first time and referred to the Committee on Government Operations and Military Affairs

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback