VT H0513 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 17 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to broadband deployment throughout Vermont

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to broadband deployment throughout Vermont

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20SenateHouse message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
2019-05-17HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment considered
2019-05-17HouseRep. McCoy of Poultney moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration
2019-05-17HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2019-05-17SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2019-05-17SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Ashe, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 0
2019-05-17SenateProposal of amendment agreed to
2019-05-17SenatePending third reading, Senator(s) Brock motion to amend proposal of amendment; text
2019-05-17SenateProposal of amendment agreed to
2019-05-17SenatePending third reading, Senator(s) Hooker and Collamore motion to amend proposal of amendment; text
2019-05-17SenatePending third reading motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Hooker and Collamore
2019-05-17SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2019-05-16Senate3rd reading ordered
2019-05-16SenateProposal of amendment  by Committee on Finance, as amended, agreed to
2019-05-16SenateProposal of amendment agreed to
2019-05-16SenateProposal of amendment by Senator(s) Brock, Balint, Campion, Cummings, MacDonald, Pearson, and Sirotkin; text
2019-05-16SenateReported favorably by Senator Ashe for Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-16SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Brock for Committee on Finance
2019-05-16SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-16SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
2019-05-16SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2019-05-15SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2019-05-15SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
2019-05-15SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-05-14SenateRules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Appropriations with the report of Committee on Finance intact, on motion of Senator Cummings
2019-05-14SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Cummings
2019-03-29SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance
2019-03-27HousePassed
2019-03-27HouseRead Third time
2019-03-26HouseThird Reading Ordered
2019-03-26HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 139, Nays = 2
2019-03-26HouseWhich was agreed to
2019-03-26HouseRep. Sibilia of Dover, Briglin of Thetford, Campbell of St. Johnsbury, Chase of Colchester, Chesnut-Tangerman of Middletown Springs, Higley of Lowell, Patt of Worcester, Scheuermann of Stowe, and Yantachka of Charlotte moved to amend the bill
2019-03-26HouseRecommendation of Amendment of the Committee on Ways and Means agreed to
2019-03-26HouseRep. Feltus of Lyndon recommended for the committee on Appropriations
2019-03-26HouseRep. Young of Greensboro recommended for the committee on Ways and Means
2019-03-26HouseRep. Sibilia of Dover spoke for the committee on Energy and Technology
2019-03-26HouseRead Second Time
2019-03-21HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
2019-03-01HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
2019-03-01HouseCommittee Bill read first time

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback