VT H0511 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-22 - House message: Governor approved bill on January 22, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to eliminating penalties for possession of limited amounts of marijuana by adults 21 years of age or older

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to eliminating penalties for possession of limited amounts of marijuana by adults 21 years of age or older

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-04 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 81, Nays = 63 (Y: 81 N: 63 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-04 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 73 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 59, Nays = 85 (Y: 59 N: 85 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2018-01-04 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 60, Nays = 85 (Y: 60 N: 85 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-01-04 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 73 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 58, Nays = 86 (Y: 58 N: 86 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2018-01-04 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 74 of 146 to Pass -- Yeas = 32, Nays = 114 (Y: 32 N: 114 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-01-04 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 74 of 146 to Pass -- Yeas = 55, Nays = 91 (Y: 55 N: 91 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-01-04 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 62, Nays = 83 (Y: 62 N: 83 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-06-21 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 106 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 78, Nays = 63 (Y: 78 N: 63 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-22SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on January 22, 2018
2018-01-22HouseSigned by Governor on January 22, 2018
2018-01-16HouseDelivered to the Governor on January 16, 2018
2018-01-11HouseSenate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in
2018-01-10SenateHouse proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in
2018-01-10SenateHouse proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment
2018-01-09SenateHouse proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment
2018-01-05SenateHouse message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment
2018-01-04HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 81, Nays = 63
2018-01-04HouseRep. Gage of Rutland City asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment
2018-01-04HouseRep. Gage of Rutland City moved to amend the amendment offered by Rep. Conquest of Newbury
2018-01-04HouseWhich was disagreed to
2018-01-04HouseRep. Dickinson of St. Albans Town moved to amend the amendment offered by Rep. Conquest of Newbury
2018-01-04HouseRoll Call Results Failed -- Needed 73 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 59, Nays = 85
2018-01-04HouseRep. Browning of Arlington moved to amend the amendment offered by Rep. Conquest of Newbury
2018-01-04HouseWhich was disagreed to
2018-01-04HouseRep. Bancroft of Westford moved to amend the amendment offered by Rep. Conquest of Newbury
2018-01-04HouseRoll Call Results Failed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 60, Nays = 85
2018-01-04HouseRep. Bancroft of Westford moved to amend the amendment offered by Rep. Conquest of Newbury
2018-01-04HouseRoll Call Results Failed -- Needed 73 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 58, Nays = 86
2018-01-04HouseRep. Donahue of Northfield moved to amend the amendment offered by Rep. Conquest of Newbury
2018-01-04HouseRoll Call Results Failed -- Needed 74 of 146 to Pass -- Yeas = 32, Nays = 114
2018-01-04HouseRep. Turner of Milton moved to amend the amendment offered by Rep. Conquest of Newbury
2018-01-04HouseRoll Call Results Failed -- Needed 74 of 146 to Pass -- Yeas = 55, Nays = 91
2018-01-04HouseRep. Turner of Milton raised a Point of Order
2018-01-04HouseRep. Browning of Arlington moved to amend the amendment offered by Rep. Conquest of Newbury
2018-01-04HouseRep. Till of Jericho asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment
2018-01-04HouseRep. Sibilia of Dover raised a Point of Order
2018-01-04HouseRep. Till of Jericho moved to amend the amendment offered by Rep. Conquest of Newbury
2018-01-04HouseWhich was disagreed to
2018-01-04HouseRep. Harrison of Chittenden moved to amend the amendment offered by Rep. Conquest of Newbury
2018-01-04HouseWhich was agreed to
2018-01-04HouseRep. Donahue of Northfield moved to amend the amendment offered by Rep. Conquest of Newbury
2018-01-04HouseRep. Conquest of Newbury moved to concur in the Senate prop of amend with a further amend thereto
2018-01-04HouseRoll Call Results Failed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 62, Nays = 83
2018-01-04HouseRep. Savage of Swanton moved to postpone action until January 18, 2018
2018-01-04HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment considered
2017-06-21SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Sears
2017-06-21SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2017-06-21SenateRules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Sears
2017-06-21Senate3rd reading ordered
2017-06-21SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to
2017-06-21SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary
2017-06-21SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Sears
2017-06-21HouseRoll Call Results Failed -- Needed 106 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 78, Nays = 63
2017-06-21HouseMotion to suspend rules as moved by Rep. Krowinski of Burlington disagreed to
2017-06-21HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2017-03-31SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
2017-03-29HousePassed
2017-03-29HouseRead Third time
2017-03-29HouseRep. McCullough of Williston asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment
2017-03-29HouseRep. McCullough of Williston moved to amend the bill
2017-03-29HouseWhich was agreed to
2017-03-29HouseRep. Lippert of Hinesburg moved to amend the bill
2017-03-29HouseWhich was agreed to
2017-03-29HouseRep. Donahue of Northfield moved to amend the bill
2017-03-28HouseThird Reading Ordered
2017-03-28HouseRep. Helm of Fair Haven recommended for the committee on Appropriations
2017-03-28HouseRep. Brennan of Colchester spoke for the committee on Transportation
2017-03-28HouseRead Second Time
2017-03-22HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
2017-03-21HouseCommittee Bill read first time

Vermont State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/status/2018/H.511
Texthttp://legislature.vermont.gov/assets/Documents/2018/Docs/BILLS/H-0511/H-0511%20As%20Introduced.pdf
Texthttp://legislature.vermont.gov/assets/Documents/2018/Docs/BILLS/H-0511/H-0511%20As%20Passed%20by%20the%20House%20Official.pdf
Texthttp://legislature.vermont.gov/assets/Documents/2018/Docs/BILLS/H-0511/H-0511%20As%20Passed%20by%20Both%20House%20and%20Senate%20Official.pdf
Texthttp://legislature.vermont.gov/assets/Documents/2018/Docs/ACTS/ACT086/ACT086%20As%20Enacted.pdf
Roll Callhttp://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2018/128
Roll Callhttp://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2018/130
Roll Callhttp://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2018/131
Roll Callhttp://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2018/132
Roll Callhttp://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2018/133
Roll Callhttp://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2018/134
Roll Callhttp://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2018/135
Roll Callhttp://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2018/136

Bill Comments

feedback