VT H0506 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on 5/9/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on 5/9/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Commercial Catering Licenses, The Export Of Vinous Beverages, And Outside Consumption Permits
Title
An Act Relating To Commercial Catering Licenses, The Export Of Vinous Beverages, And Outside Consumption Permits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-05 | Signed by Governor on 5/9/2012 | |
2012-05-05 | Delivered to the Governor on 5/9/2012 | |
2012-05-02 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-05-02 | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in | |
2012-05-02 | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text | |
2012-05-02 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-05-02 | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment | |
2012-05-02 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-05-01 | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment | |
2012-05-02 | Passed the House and Senate on 5/2/2012 | |
2012-05-01 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2012-05-01 | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Smith of New Haven | |
2012-04-28 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza | |
2012-04-28 | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment | |
2012-04-28 | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Mazza | |
2012-04-28 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2012-04-28 | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs agreed to | |
2012-04-28 | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Ashe for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs | |
2012-04-28 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-27 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-26 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs | |
2012-04-26 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-04-25 | Committee on Rules relieved; bill committed to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs on motion of Senator Mazza | |
2012-04-10 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules | |
2012-04-05 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2012-04-04 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2012-04-04 | Report of Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs and Ways and Means agreed to. | |
2012-04-03 | Rep. Rep. Condon of Colchester, recommended for the committee on Ways and Means | |
2012-04-03 | Rep. Rep. Smith of New Haven reported for the committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs | |
2012-04-04 | Read Second Time | |
2012-03-13 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) | |
2012-01-10 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs |