VT H0503 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-07 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 7, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-07 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 7, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to to criminal justice
Title
An act relating to to criminal justice
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-07 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on June 7, 2017 |
2017-06-07 | House | Signed by Governor on June 7, 2017 |
2017-06-01 | House | Delivered to the Governor on June 1, 2017 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | House message House adopted Conference Committee report |
2017-05-10 | House | Committee of Conference report adopted (House bill) |
2017-05-10 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Committee of Conference report adopted |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Sears for Committee, text |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Committee of Conference Report |
2017-05-08 | Senate | New Business/Committee of Conference Report |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Committee of Conference Report |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Sears, Nitka, and Benning |
2017-05-01 | Senate | House message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed |
2017-04-28 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2017-04-28 | House | Speaker appointed Lalonde of South Burlington, Conquest of Newbury and Shaw of Pittsford as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2017-04-28 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. Lalonde of South Burlington |
2017-04-28 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment considered |
2017-04-28 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2017-04-27 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Sears; text |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend bill offered by Senator(s) Sears |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Sears |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-04-25 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-23 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2017-03-22 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2017-03-22 | House | Amendment as offered by Rep. Shaw of Pittsford agreed to |
2017-03-22 | House | Rep. Lalonde of South Burlington spoke for the committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-22 | House | Read Second Time |
2017-03-17 | House | Committee Bill read first time |