VT H0501 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the regulation of food depackaging facilities
Title
An act relating to the regulation of food depackaging facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2022-02-25 | House | Read Third time and passed |
2022-02-25 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2022-02-24 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2022-02-24 | House | Report of Committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife agreed to |
2022-02-24 | House | Rep. McCullough of Williston reported for the Committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife |
2022-02-24 | House | Read Second time |
2022-02-24 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-02-23 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-01-07 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, Fish, and Wildlife |