VT H0497 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on May 23, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating To The Open Meeting Law

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Relating To The Open Meeting Law

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-10HouseSigned by Governor on May 23, 2014
2014-05-07HouseSenate Message, Passed in Concurrence
2014-05-07SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth
2014-05-07SenateHouse proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in
2014-05-07SenateHouse proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text
2014-05-07SenateRules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Baruth
2014-05-07SenateHouse message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment
2014-05-07HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2014-05-07HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Higley of Lowell
2014-05-05SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell
2014-05-05SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2014-05-05SenateProposal of amendment agreed to
2014-05-05SenatePending third reading, Senator(s) White motion to amend proposal of amendment; text
2014-05-05SenateProposal of amendment not agreed to
2014-05-05SenatePending third reading, Senator(s) Cummings motion to amend proposal of amendment; text
2014-05-05HouseSenate message passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2014-05-05SenatePending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) White
2014-05-05SenatePending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Cummings
2014-05-05SenateUnfinished Business/Third Reading
2014-05-03SenatePending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) White
2014-05-03SenatePending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Cummings
2014-05-03SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2014-05-02Senate3rd reading ordered
2014-05-02SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to
2014-05-02SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Government Operations
2014-05-02SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
2014-05-02SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2014-05-01SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
2014-03-12SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations
2014-02-28HouseRead Third time and Passed
2014-02-27HouseAmendment of Committee on Government Operations agreed to and Third Reading Ordered
2014-02-27HouseRep. Townsend of South Burlington reported for the committee on Government Operations
2014-02-27HouseRead Second Time
2013-03-12HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback