VT H0494 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - House message: Governor approved bill on 5/17/17
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - House message: Governor approved bill on 5/17/17
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the Transportation Program and miscellaneous changes to transportation-related law
Title
An act relating to the Transportation Program and miscellaneous changes to transportation-related law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-13 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Mazza, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on 5/17/17 |
2017-05-17 | House | Signed by Governor on May 17, 2017 |
2017-05-11 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 11, 2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | House message House adopted Conference Committee report |
2017-05-01 | House | Committee of Conference report adopted (House bill) |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Committee of Conference report adopted |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Mazza for Committee, text |
2017-04-28 | Senate | New Business/Committee of Conference Report |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Committee of Conference Report |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Mazza, Westman, and Degree |
2017-04-20 | Senate | House message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed |
2017-04-19 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2017-04-19 | House | Speaker appointed Brennan of Colchester, Potter of Clarendon and Bissonnette of Winooski as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2017-04-19 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. Brennan of Colchester |
2017-04-19 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment considered |
2017-04-14 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Mazza, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 0 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Flory, Degree, Kitchel, Mazza, and Westman; text |
2017-04-13 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2017-04-12 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Transportation, as amended, agreed to |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Transportation amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations with proposal of amendment |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Mazza for Committee on Transportation |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Transportation |
2017-04-12 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Transportation |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Transportation |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-03-15 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2017-03-14 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2017-03-14 | House | Rep. Helm of Fair Haven recommended for the committee on Appropriations |
2017-03-14 | House | Rep. Brennan of Colchester spoke for the committee on Transportation |
2017-03-14 | House | Read Second Time |
2017-03-03 | House | Rep. Brennan of Colchester moved to postpone action until March 13, 2017 which was agreed to |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2017-02-28 | House | Committee Bill read first time |