VT H0493 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-14 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-14 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to relief from abuse orders
Title
An act relating to relief from abuse orders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-03 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2017-03-02 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2017-03-02 | House | Rep. Morris of Bennington spoke for the committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-02 | House | Read Second Time |
2017-02-28 | House | Committee Bill read first time |