VT H0493 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-30 - Signed by Governor on 1/30/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-30 - Signed by Governor on 1/30/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Approval Of Amendments To The Charter Of The City Of South Burlington
Title
An Act Relating To Approval Of Amendments To The Charter Of The City Of South Burlington
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-30 | Signed by Governor on 1/30/2012 | |
2012-01-25 | Delivered to the Governor on 1/25/2012 | |
2012-01-24 | Passed the House and Senate on 1/24/2012 | |
2012-01-24 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator White | |
2012-01-24 | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence | |
2012-01-24 | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator White | |
2012-01-24 | Reported favorably by Senator White for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered | |
2012-01-24 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator White | |
2012-01-24 | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations | |
2012-01-24 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-01-19 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations | |
2012-01-17 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2012-01-17 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2012-01-17 | Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2012-01-17 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2012-01-17 | Rep. Atkins of Winooski spoke for the committee on Government Operations | |
2012-01-17 | Read Second Time | |
2012-01-05 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |