VT H0485 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on 5/16/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on 5/16/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Establishing Universal Recycling Of Solid Waste
Title
An Act Relating To Establishing Universal Recycling Of Solid Waste
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-05 | Signed by Governor on 5/16/2012 | |
2012-05-05 | Delivered to the Governor on 5/11/2012 | |
2012-05-04 | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment | |
2012-05-04 | Rules Suspended and Action on the bill messaged to the Senate forthwith and the bill delivered to the Governor forthwith as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton. | |
2012-05-04 | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in | |
2012-05-02 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-05-02 | House proposal of amendment concurred in with proposal of amendment | |
2012-05-02 | Senator Lyons moved to concur in House proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment; text | |
2012-05-01 | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment | |
2012-05-01 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-04-30 | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment | |
2012-04-30 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton | |
2012-04-30 | Rep Jerman of Essex moved to concur with the Senate proposal of amendment with a further amendment thereto, which was agreed to | |
2012-04-26 | Senator Sears explained vote | |
2012-04-26 | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence on roll call, requested by Senator Campbell, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 0 | |
2012-04-26 | Proposal of amendment agreed to | |
2012-04-26 | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Ashe and Mazza; text | |
2012-04-26 | Proposal of amendment agreed to | |
2012-04-26 | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) White; text | |
2012-04-26 | Second proposal of amendment withdrawn | |
2012-04-26 | Roll Call, requested by Senator Pollina, Failed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 12, Nays = 18 | |
2012-04-26 | Proposal of amendment in the first instance not agreed to | |
2012-04-26 | Question divided on demand of Senator Galbraith | |
2012-04-26 | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Pollina and Ashe; text | |
2012-04-26 | Proposal of amendment agreed to | |
2012-04-26 | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Ashe; text | |
2012-04-26 | Proposal of amendment agreed to | |
2012-04-26 | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Kittell; text | |
2012-04-26 | Unfinished Business/Third Reading | |
2012-04-25 | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) White | |
2012-04-25 | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Pollina and Ashe | |
2012-04-25 | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Kittell | |
2012-04-25 | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Ashe | |
2012-04-25 | Unfinished Business/Third Reading | |
2012-04-24 | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Pollina and Ashe | |
2012-04-24 | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Kittell | |
2012-04-24 | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) White | |
2012-04-24 | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Ashe | |
2012-04-24 | Unfinished Business/Third Reading | |
2012-04-23 | Unfinished Business/Third Reading | |
2012-04-21 | Unfinished Business/Third Reading | |
2012-04-20 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2012-04-20 | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, as amended, agreed to | |
2012-04-20 | Senator Pollina moved to amend the recommendation of proposal of amendment of the Committee on Natural Resources and Energy text | |
2012-04-20 | Senator MacDonald moved to amend the recommendation of proposal of amendment of the Committee on Natural Resources and Energy text | |
2012-04-20 | Motion agreed to | |
2012-04-20 | Senators McCormack and Illuzzi amendment to recommendation of proposal of amendment in the 2nd and 4th instance adopted | |
2012-04-20 | Roll Call, requested by Senator MacDonald, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 22, Nays = 7 | |
2012-04-20 | Senator McCormack and Illuzzi amendment to recommendation of proposal of amendment in the 1st, 3rd and 5th instance adopted | |
2012-04-20 | Question divided on demand of Senator Galbraith | |
2012-04-20 | Senator(s) McCormack and Illuzzi motion to amend Committee on Natural Resources and Energy proposal of amendment; text | |
2012-04-20 | Senator McCormack requested & granted leave to withdraw motion | |
2012-04-20 | Consideration resumed | |
2012-04-20 | Consideration postponed on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-04-20 | Question divided on demand of Senator Galbraith | |
2012-04-20 | Senator McCormack moved to amend the recommendation of proposal of amendment of the Committee on Natural Resources and Energy text | |
2012-04-20 | Senator McCormack requested & granted leave to withdraw motion | |
2012-04-20 | Senator Illuzzi requested & granted leave to withdraw motion | |
2012-04-20 | Consideration resumed | |
2012-04-20 | Consideration postponed on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-04-20 | Senator Illuzzi moved to substitute amendment to recommendation of proposal of amendment of Committee on Natural Resources and Energy | |
2012-04-20 | Senator McCormack moved to amend the recommendation of proposal of amendment of the Committee on Natural Resources and Energy | |
2012-04-20 | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator McCormack for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy | |
2012-04-20 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-19 | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Illuzzi | |
2012-04-19 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-18 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-17 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-16 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy | |
2012-04-16 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-03-14 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy | |
2012-03-02 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2012-03-02 | Rep. Olsen of Jamaica moved to amend the bill which was agreed to | |
2012-03-02 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Jerman of Essex agreed to | |
2012-03-02 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Bartholomew of Hartland withdrawn | |
2012-03-01 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2012-03-01 | Report of Committee on Natural Resources and Energy as amended agreed to | |
2012-03-01 | Report of the Committee on Natural Resources and Energy amended as offered by Rep. Donahue of Northfield | |
2012-03-01 | Rep. Jerman of Essex reported for the committee on Natural Resources and Energy | |
2012-03-01 | Read Second Time | |
2012-01-05 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |