VT H0483 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on May 28, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on May 28, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Adopting Revisions To Article 9 Of The Uniform Commercial Code
Title
An Act Relating To Adopting Revisions To Article 9 Of The Uniform Commercial Code
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor on May 28, 2014 |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell |
2014-05-05 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2014-05-05 | House | Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2014-05-03 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment |
2014-05-02 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment |
2014-05-01 | Senate | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment |
2014-04-29 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Carr of Brandon |
2014-04-29 | House | Rep. Carr of Brandon reported for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development |
2014-04-22 | House | Rep. Botzow of Pownal moved to commit bill to the committee on Commerce and Economic Development which was agreed to. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2014-04-16 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2014-04-15 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Ashe agreed to |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Ashe; text |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Ashe for Committee on Finance |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2014-04-15 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Committee on Rules relieved; bill committed to Committee on Finance on motion of Senator Campbell |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-05-01 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2013-05-01 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2013-04-30 | House | Amendment of Committee on Commerce and Economic Development agreed to and Third Reading Ordered |
2013-04-30 | House | Rep. Carr of Brandon reported for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development |
2013-04-30 | House | Read Second Time |
2013-03-12 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development |