VT H0477 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 24, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 24, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to leave for crime victims
Title
An act relating to leave for crime victims
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on May 24, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | House | Signed by Governor on May 24, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 18, 2022 |
2022-05-11 | House | Senate Message, passed in concurrence |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Ram Hinsdale for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2022-02-10 | House | Read Third time and passed |
2022-02-10 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2022-02-09 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2022-02-09 | House | Report of Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs agreed to |
2022-02-09 | House | Rep. Stevens of Waterbury reported for the Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs |
2022-02-09 | House | Read Second time |
2022-02-09 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-02-08 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-01-07 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs |