VT H0465 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 24, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 24, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to boards and commissions
Title
An act relating to boards and commissions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on May 24, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | House | Signed by Governor on May 24, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 18, 2022 |
2022-05-11 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-05-11 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2022-05-11 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-05-10 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-05-09 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment |
2022-05-09 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2022-05-09 | House | Senate proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Higley of Lowell, Colston of Winooski, Copeland Hanzas of Bradford, Gannon of Wilmington, Hooper of Burlington, and McCarthy of St. Albans City |
2022-05-09 | House | Senate proposal of amendment considered |
2022-05-09 | House | Action Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-05-07 | House | Action Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-05-06 | House | Notice Calendar: Senate proposal of amendment |
2022-05-05 | House | Senate Message, passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2022-05-05 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2022-05-04 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations, as amended, agreed to |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations with proposal of amendment |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Collamore for Committee on Government Operations |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2022-05-02 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2022-03-18 | House | Read Third time and passed |
2022-03-18 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2022-03-17 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2022-03-17 | House | Report of Committee on Government Operations as amended agreed to |
2022-03-17 | House | Rep. Higley of Lowell, Anthony of Barre City, Colston of Winooski, Copeland Hanzas of Bradford, Gannon of Wilmington, Hooper of Burlington, LaClair of Barre Town, Lefebvre of Orange, McCarthy of St. Albans City, Mrowicki of Putney, and Vyhovsky of Essex moved to amend the report of the Committee on Government Operations, as amended, which was agreed to |
2022-03-17 | House | Report of the Committee on Government Operations amended as recommended by the Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-17 | House | Rep. Harrison of Chittenden recommended for the Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-17 | House | Rep. Higley of Lowell reported for the Committee on Government Operations |
2022-03-17 | House | Read Second time |
2022-03-17 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-03-16 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-03-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2022-03-15 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-01-07 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Government Operations |