VT H0464 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on 5/16/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on 5/16/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Hydraulic Fracturing Wells For Natural Gas And Oil Production
Title
An Act Relating To Hydraulic Fracturing Wells For Natural Gas And Oil Production
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-05 | Signed by Governor on 5/16/2012 | |
2012-05-05 | Delivered to the Governor on 5/10/2012 | |
2012-05-04 | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 139 to Pass -- Yeas = 103, Nays = 36 | |
2012-05-04 | Committee of Conference report agreed to (House bill) | |
2012-05-02 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-05-02 | Committee of Conference report adopted | |
2012-05-02 | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Lyons for Committee, text | |
2012-05-02 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2012-04-27 | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Lyons, Benning, and MacDonald | |
2012-04-24 | House message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed | |
2012-04-24 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2012-04-24 | Speaker appointed McCullough of Williston, Krebs of South Hero and Webb of Shelburne as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House | |
2012-04-24 | Senate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. McCullough of Williston | |
2012-04-19 | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment | |
2012-04-19 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2012-04-19 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2012-04-19 | Roll Call, requested by Senator Galbraith, Passed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 1 | |
2012-04-19 | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy agreed to | |
2012-04-19 | Motion to amend by Senator(s) Brock disagreed to on division Yeas 7, Nays 21 | |
2012-04-19 | Senator(s) Brock motion to amend Committee on Natural Resources and Energy proposal of amendment; text | |
2012-04-18 | Point of order overruled by the President | |
2012-04-18 | Point of order raised by Senator(s) Flory | |
2012-04-19 | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Lyons for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy | |
2012-04-18 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-17 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-16 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy | |
2012-04-16 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-02-07 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy | |
2012-02-01 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2012-01-31 | Amendment of Committee on Fish, Wildlife & Water Resources agreed to and Third Reading Ordered | |
2012-01-31 | Rep. Rep. McCullough of Williston reported for the committee on Fish, Wildlife & Water Resources | |
2012-01-31 | Read Second Time | |
2012-01-03 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Fish, Wildlife & Water Resources |