VT H0460 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-06 - Signed by Governor on 6/1/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on May 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-06 - Signed by Governor on 6/1/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Amending The Charter Of The City Of Barre
Title
An Act Relating To Amending The Charter Of The City Of Barre
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-06 | Signed by Governor on 6/1/2011 | |
2011-05-06 | Passed the House and Senate on 5/6/2011 | |
2011-05-06 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-05-06 | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence | |
2011-05-06 | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-05-06 | Reported favorably by Senator Pollina for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered | |
2011-05-06 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-05-06 | Committee on Rules relieved; bill committed to Committee on Government Operations on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-05-06 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-05-06 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules | |
2011-05-05 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2011-05-05 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2011-05-05 | Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2011-05-05 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2011-05-05 | Rep. Rep. Townsend of Randolph reported for the committee on Government Operations | |
2011-05-05 | Read Second Time | |
2011-05-05 | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2011-05-03 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |