VT H0458 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-28 - Signed by Governor on 4/28/16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-28 - Signed by Governor on 4/28/16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to automatic voter registration through motor vehicle driver’s license applications
Title
An act relating to automatic voter registration through motor vehicle driver’s license applications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-13 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 64 of 126 to Pass -- Yeas = 125, Nays = 1 (Y: 125 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Degree, Passed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 28, Nays = 0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 137 to Pass -- Yeas = 137, Nays = 0 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Degree, Passed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 28, Nays = 0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 137 to Pass -- Yeas = 137, Nays = 0 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | House | Signed by Governor on 4/28/16 |
2016-04-26 | House | Delivered to the Governor on 4/26/16 |
2016-04-13 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2016-04-13 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 64 of 126 to Pass -- Yeas = 125, Nays = 1 |
2016-04-13 | House | Senate proposal of amendment considered |
2016-04-08 | House | Senate message passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Degree, Passed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 28, Nays = 0 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Benning, Bray, Collamore, Pollina, and White motion to amend proposal of amendment; text |
2016-04-07 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2016-04-06 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations, as amended, agreed to |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations amended as moved by Senator(s) Benning, Collamore, Pollina, and White |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Benning for Committee on Government Operations |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2016-04-05 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed |
2016-03-08 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 137 to Pass -- Yeas = 137, Nays = 0 |
2016-03-08 | House | Read Third time |
2016-03-08 | House | Which was agreed to |
2016-03-08 | House | Rep. Donahue of Northfield moved to amend the bill |
2016-02-26 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2016-02-26 | House | Report of Committee on Government Operations agreed to. |
2016-02-26 | House | Rep. LaClair of Barre Town reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2016-02-26 | House | Read Second Time |
2016-01-13 | House | Rep. Brennan of Colchester moved that the committee on Transportation be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the committee on Government Operations which was agreed to. |
2015-03-10 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Transportation |