VT H0453 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-02 - Committee on Rules relieved; bill committed to Committee on Finance on motion of Senator Campbell
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-02 - Committee on Rules relieved; bill committed to Committee on Finance on motion of Senator Campbell
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To The Annual Tax Expenditure Budget
Title
An Act Relating To The Annual Tax Expenditure Budget
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-02 | Committee on Rules relieved; bill committed to Committee on Finance on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-04-20 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules | |
2011-04-19 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2011-04-15 | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 66 of 131 to Pass -- Yeas = 131, Nays = 0 | |
2011-04-15 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2011-04-14 | Rep. Rep. Sharpe of Bristol spoke for the committee on Ways and Means | |
2011-04-15 | Read Second Time | |
2011-04-13 | Placed on Calendar for Notice on 4/13/2011 |