VT H0446 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-06 - Signed by Governor on 5/20/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-06 - Signed by Governor on 5/20/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Capital Construction And State Bonding
Title
An Act Relating To Capital Construction And State Bonding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-06 | Signed by Governor on 5/20/2011 | |
2011-05-06 | Delivered to the Governor on 5/16/2011 | |
2011-05-05 | Committee of Conference report agreed to (House bill) | |
2011-05-05 | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2011-05-05 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-05-05 | Committee of Conference report adopted on roll call, requested by Senator Hartwell, Passed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 28, Nays = 0 | |
2011-05-05 | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Hartwell for Committee, text | |
2011-05-05 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-04-25 | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Hartwell, Mazza, and Benning | |
2011-04-25 | House message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed | |
2011-04-22 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2011-04-22 | Speaker appointed Emmons of Springfield, Hooper of Montpelier and Myers of Essex as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House | |
2011-04-22 | Committee of Conference appointed | |
2011-04-22 | Senate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. Emmons of Springfield | |
2011-04-20 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-04-20 | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Hartwell, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 | |
2011-04-20 | Division yays 14, nays 10, as requested by Senator Mazza | |
2011-04-20 | Pending third reading, Senate proposal of amendment amended as moved by Senator(s) Illuzzi | |
2011-04-20 | Pending third reading, Senate proposal of amendment amended as moved by Senator(s) Illuzzi and Starr | |
2011-04-20 | Pending third reading, Senate proposal of amendment amended as moved by Senator(s) Illuzzi | |
2011-04-20 | Pending third reading, motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Hartwell for the Committee on Institutions agreed to | |
2011-04-20 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2011-04-19 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2011-04-19 | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Institutions agreed to | |
2011-04-19 | Reported favorably by Senator Illuzzi for Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-04-19 | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Hartwell for Committee on Institutions | |
2011-04-19 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-04-19 | Rules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Appropriations with the report of Committee on Institutions intact, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-04-19 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-04-05 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Institutions | |
2011-04-01 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2011-04-01 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2011-04-01 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Kilmartin of Newport City withdrawn | |
2011-04-01 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Emmons of Springfield agreed to | |
2011-04-01 | Rep. Emmons of Springfield moved to amend the bill | |
2011-04-01 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Emmons of Springfield agreed to | |
2011-03-31 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2011-03-31 | Rep. Scheuermann of Stowe moved to amend the bill which was agreed to | |
2011-03-31 | Rep. Johnson of South Hero, recommended for the committee on Appropriations | |
2011-03-31 | Rep. Emmons of Springfield spoke for the committee on Corrections and Institutions | |
2011-03-31 | Read Second Time | |
2011-03-29 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-03-29 | Placed on Calendar for Notice on 3/29/2011 |