VT H0439 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-14 - Committee on Rules relieved; bill committed to Committee on Finance on motion of Senator Carris
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-14 - Committee on Rules relieved; bill committed to Committee on Finance on motion of Senator Carris
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To The Bill-back Authority Of The Department Of Public Service And The Public Service Board
Title
An Act Relating To The Bill-back Authority Of The Department Of Public Service And The Public Service Board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | Committee on Rules relieved; bill committed to Committee on Finance on motion of Senator Carris | |
2011-04-08 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules | |
2011-04-06 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2011-04-05 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2011-04-05 | Rep. Keenan of St. Albans City, recommended for the committee on Appropriations | |
2011-04-05 | Rep. Ralston of Middlebury spoke for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development | |
2011-04-05 | Read Second Time | |
2011-03-23 | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) | |
2011-03-22 | Placed on Calendar for Notice on 3/22/2011 |