VT H0437 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Referred to Committee on Finance per Temporary Senate Rule 44A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to changes that affect the revenue of the State

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to changes that affect the revenue of the State

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-25 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 146 to Pass -- Yeas = 95, Nays = 51 (Y: 95 N: 51 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 74 of 147 to Pass -- Yeas = 53, Nays = 94 (Y: 53 N: 94 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-09SenateReferred to Committee on Finance per Temporary Senate Rule 44A
2021-03-31SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules
2021-03-26HouseRead Third time and Passed
2021-03-26HouseWhich was agreed to
2021-03-26HouseRep. Long of Newfane moved to suspend Rule 78 to permit reconsideration immediately
2021-03-26HousePoint of order ruled well taken
2021-03-26HouseRep. Donahue of Northfield raised a Point of Order
2021-03-26HouseDivision Results 94 Yes, 45 No
2021-03-26HouseRead Third time and Passed
2021-03-25HouseThird Reading Ordered
2021-03-25HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 146 to Pass -- Yeas = 95, Nays = 51
2021-03-25HouseRep. Burditt of West Rutland demanded yeas and nays
2021-03-25HouseAmendment as offered by Rep. Scheuermann of Stowe disagreed to
2021-03-25HouseRoll Call Results Failed -- Needed 74 of 147 to Pass -- Yeas = 53, Nays = 94
2021-03-25HouseRep. Harrison of Chittenden demanded yeas and nays
2021-03-25HouseRep. Kornheiser of Brattleboro spoke for the Committee on Ways and Means
2021-03-25HouseRead Second Time
2021-03-23HouseCommittee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on March 24, 2021

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback