VT H0436 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-06 - Signed by Governor on 5/24/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-06 - Signed by Governor on 5/24/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Tax Changes, Including Income Taxes, Property Taxes, Economic Development Credits, Health Care-related Tax Provisions, And Miscellaneous Tax Provisions
Title
An Act Relating To Tax Changes, Including Income Taxes, Property Taxes, Economic Development Credits, Health Care-related Tax Provisions, And Miscellaneous Tax Provisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-06 | Signed by Governor on 5/24/2011 | |
2011-05-06 | Delivered to the Governor on 5/18/2011 | |
2011-05-06 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2011-05-06 | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 94, Nays = 48 | |
2011-05-06 | Committee of Conference report agreed to (House bill) | |
2011-05-06 | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2011-05-05 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-05-05 | Committee of Conference report adopted on roll call, requested by Senator Brock, Passed -- Needed 14 of 27 to Pass -- Yeas = 17, Nays = 10 | |
2011-05-05 | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Cummings for Committee, text | |
2011-05-05 | On motion of Senator Illuzzi, rules suspended to allow consideratin of the Report of the Committee of Conference notwithstanding the violation of Mason's Rule 771.2 | |
2011-05-05 | Point of order sustained by the President | |
2011-05-05 | Point of order raised by Senator Illuzzi on ground Conference Committee breached Sec. 771.2 of Mason's Manual of Legislative Procedure | |
2011-05-05 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-04-26 | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Cummings, MacDonald, and Ashe | |
2011-04-26 | House message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed | |
2011-04-26 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2011-04-26 | Speaker appointed Ancel of Calais, Branagan of Georgia and Sharpe of Bristol as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House | |
2011-04-26 | Committee of Conference appointed | |
2011-04-26 | Senate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. Ancel of Calais | |
2011-04-22 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-04-22 | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment | |
2011-04-22 | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-04-22 | 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Campbell, Passed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 20, Nays = 8 | |
2011-04-22 | Proposal of amendment agreed to | |
2011-04-22 | Senator(s) Brock motion to substitute proposal of amendment; text | |
2011-04-22 | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Brock; text | |
2011-04-22 | Proposal of amendment not agreed to | |
2011-04-22 | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Brock; text | |
2011-04-22 | Senator Kittell requested & granted leave to withdraw amendment | |
2011-04-22 | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Kittell; text | |
2011-04-22 | Proposal of amendment agreed to on roll call, requested by Senator McCormack, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 15, Nays = 14 | |
2011-04-22 | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Starr; text | |
2011-04-22 | Proposal of amendment agreed to | |
2011-04-22 | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Westman and MacDonald; text | |
2011-04-22 | Proposal of amendment agreed to | |
2011-04-22 | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Westman and MacDonald; text | |
2011-04-22 | Senator MacDonald and Brock requested & granted leave to withdraw the substitute amendment and the underlying proposal of amendment | |
2011-04-22 | Senator(s) MacDonald motion to substitute proposal of amendment; text | |
2011-04-22 | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Brock; text | |
2011-04-22 | Proposal of amendment agreed to | |
2011-04-22 | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Brock; text | |
2011-04-22 | Roll Call, requested by Senator Pollina, Failed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 7, Nays = 22 | |
2011-04-22 | Proposal of amendment not agreed to | |
2011-04-22 | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Pollina; text | |
2011-04-22 | Proposal of amendment agreed to | |
2011-04-22 | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Cummings; text | |
2011-04-22 | Consideration resumed | |
2011-04-22 | Consideration postponed; Second reading | |
2011-04-21 | Division of the Senate | |
2011-04-21 | Motion disagreed to | |
2011-04-21 | Point of order overruled by the President | |
2011-04-21 | Point of order raised by Senator(s) Pollina | |
2011-04-21 | Motion by Senator Lyons to suspend Rule 73 to allow reconsideration of previous vote taken | |
2011-04-21 | Consideration postponed without objection | |
2011-04-21 | Roll Call, requested by Senator Baruth, Failed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 14, Nays = 16 | |
2011-04-21 | Committee on Finance Proposal #11 (cigarette tax) disagreed to | |
2011-04-21 | Committee on Finance Proposals #1-10 & #12-25 agreed to | |
2011-04-21 | Question on Finance 11th proposal of amendment divided on request of Senator Sears | |
2011-04-21 | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Cummings for Committee on Finance | |
2011-04-21 | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Brock | |
2011-04-21 | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Pollina | |
2011-04-21 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2011-04-20 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2011-04-19 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance | |
2011-03-25 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-03-23 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2011-03-23 | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 48, Nays = 93 | |
2011-03-23 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Bouchard of Colchester disagreed to | |
2011-03-23 | Amendment as offered by Rep. McNeil of Rutland Town disagreed to | |
2011-03-23 | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 69 of 137 to Pass -- Yeas = 49, Nays = 88 | |
2011-03-23 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Hubert of Milton disagreed to | |
2011-03-23 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Hubert of Milton disagreed to | |
2011-03-23 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Wright of Burlington withdrawn | |
2011-03-23 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Ancel of Calais agreed to | |
2011-03-23 | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 53, Nays = 88 | |
2011-03-23 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Higley of Lowell disagreed to | |
2011-03-23 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Wizowaty of Burlington withdrawn | |
2011-03-23 | Amendment as offered by Rep. Pearson of Burlington withdrawn | |
2011-03-22 | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 137 to Pass -- Yeas = 90, Nays = 47 | |
2011-03-22 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2011-03-22 | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 69 of 136 to Pass -- Yeas = 48, Nays = 88 | |
2011-03-22 | Rep. Wright of Burlington and Komline of Dorset moved to amend the bill which was disagreed to | |
2011-03-22 | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 137 to Pass -- Yeas = 117, Nays = 20 | |
2011-03-22 | Rep. Branagan of Georgia moved to amend the bill which was agreed to | |
2011-03-22 | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 23, Nays = 117 | |
2011-03-22 | Rep. Poirier of Barre City and Pearson of Burlington moved to amend the bill which was disagreed to | |
2011-03-22 | Rep. Ancel of Calais spoke for the committee on Ways and Means | |
2011-03-22 | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |