VT H0429 | 2023-2024 | Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Recommitted to Committee on Government Operations on motion of Senator Baruth
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to miscellaneous changes to election laws

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to miscellaneous changes to election laws

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-20SenateRecommitted to Committee on Government Operations on motion of Senator Baruth
2023-06-20SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2023-05-12Senate3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Clarkson, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 16, Nays = 14
2023-05-12SenateSenator McCormack explained vote
2023-05-12SenateProposal of amendment agreed to on roll call, requested by Senator Hardy, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 17, Nays = 13
2023-05-12SenateReported favorably by Senator Perchlik for Committee on Appropriations
2023-05-12SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Hardy for Committee on Government Operations
2023-05-12SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2023-05-12SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
2023-05-12SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2023-05-11SenateFavorable report by Committee on Appropriations
2023-05-11SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
2023-05-11SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2023-05-10SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2023-05-10SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations
2023-05-10SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2023-03-15SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations
2023-03-03HouseRead third time and passed
2023-03-03HouseSecond division of amendment disagreed to
2023-03-03HouseFirst division of amendment disagreed to
2023-03-03HouseRep. Cina of Burlington asked that the question be divided
2023-03-03HouseRep. Sibilia of Dover moved to amend the bill
2023-03-03HouseRep. Sibilia of Dover asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment
2023-03-03HouseRep. Sibilia of Dover moved to amend the bill
2023-03-03HouseRep. Gregoire of Fairfield moved to amend the bill, which was disagreed to
2023-03-03HouseRep. Gregoire of Fairfield asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment
2023-03-03HouseRep. Gregoire of Fairfield moved to amend the bill
2023-03-03HouseAction Calendar: Third reading
2023-03-02HouseThird Reading ordered
2023-03-02HouseRep. McCarthy of St. Albans City, Birong of Vergennes, Krasnow of South Burlington, and Small of Winooski moved to amend the bill, which was agreed to
2023-03-02HouseSecond division of amendment disagreed to
2023-03-02HouseDivision results Yeas 38, Nays 96
2023-03-02HouseDivision demanded
2023-03-02HouseFirst division of amendment disagreed to
2023-03-02HouseRoll Call Results Failed -- Needed 69 of 137 to Pass -- Yeas = 59, Nays = 78
2023-03-02HouseRep. Logan of Burlington demanded yeas and nays
2023-03-02HouseRep. Elder of Starksboro asked that the question be divided
2023-03-02HouseRep. Sibilia of Dover moved to amend the bill
2023-03-02HouseRep. McCarthy of St. Albans City spoke for the Committee on Government Operations and Military Affairs
2023-03-02HouseRead second time
2023-03-02HouseAction Calendar: Committee bill for second reading
2023-03-01HouseNotice Calendar: Committee bill for second reading
2023-02-28HouseCommittee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on March 1, 2023

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback