VT H0426 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-06 - Signed by Governor on 5/11/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating To Extending The State's Reporting Concerning Transportation Of Children In State Custody And Transportation Of Individuals In The Custody Of The Commissioner Of Mental Health

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Relating To Extending The State's Reporting Concerning Transportation Of Children In State Custody And Transportation Of Individuals In The Custody Of The Commissioner Of Mental Health

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-06 Signed by Governor on 5/11/2011
2011-04-29 House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
2011-04-28 Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2011-04-28 Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
2011-04-28 Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton
2011-04-27 Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell
2011-04-27 Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2011-04-27 Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Campbell
2011-04-27 3rd reading ordered
2011-04-27 Proposal of amendment agreed to
2011-04-27 Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Fox; text
2011-04-27 Pending Question: Shall the bill be read the 3rd time?
2011-04-27 Consideration resumed
2011-04-27 Unfinished Business/Second Reading
2011-04-26 Unfinished Business/Second Reading
2011-04-25 Unfinished Business/Second Reading
2011-04-22 Consideration postponed; Second reading
2011-04-21 Consideration postponed to next legislative day on motion of Senator Ayer
2011-04-21 Read 2nd time
2011-04-21 Reported favorably by Senator Ayer for Committee on Health and Welfare
2011-04-21 New Business/Second Reading
2011-04-20 Favorable report by Committee on Health and Welfare
2011-04-20 Entered on Notice Calendar
2011-03-16 Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare
2011-03-11 Read Third time and Passed
2011-03-10 Third Reading Ordered
2011-03-09 Rep. Rep. Donahue of Northfield spoke for the committee on Human Services
2011-03-10 Read Second Time
2011-03-08 Placed on Calendar for Notice on 3/8/2011

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback