VT H0414 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 12, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 12, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to establishing an unused drug repository for Vermont
Title
An act relating to establishing an unused drug repository for Vermont
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-20 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on June 12, 2023 |
2023-05-12 | House | Signed by Governor on June 12, 2023 |
2023-05-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor on June 6, 2023 |
2023-05-05 | House | Senate Message: Passed in concurrence |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2023-05-05 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2023-05-04 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Westman for Committee on Appropriations |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Williams for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2023-05-04 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |
2023-03-28 | House | Read third time and passed |
2023-03-28 | House | Action Calendar: Third Reading |
2023-03-24 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2023-03-24 | House | Report of Committee on Health Care agreed to |
2023-03-24 | House | Rep. Dickinson of St. Albans Town recommended for the Committee on Appropriations |
2023-03-24 | House | Rep. Goldman of Rockingham reported for the Committee on Health Care |
2023-03-24 | House | Read second time |
2023-03-24 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2023-03-23 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2023-03-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2023-03-21 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2023-02-28 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on Health Care |