VT H0410 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 21, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to appliance efficiency, energy planning, and electric vehicle parking

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to appliance efficiency, energy planning, and electric vehicle parking

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-21SenateHouse message: Governor approved bill on May 21, 2018
2018-05-21HouseSigned by Governor on May 21, 2018
2018-05-16HouseDelivered to the Governor on May 16, 2018
2018-05-10HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
2018-05-10HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment considered
2018-05-10HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton
2018-05-09HouseSenate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2018-05-09SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint
2018-05-09SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Bray, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 25, Nays = 4
2018-05-09SenatePending third reading, motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment agreed to
2018-05-09SenateSenator(s) Sears and Ashe to substitute amendment agreed to
2018-05-09SenateSenator(s) Sears and Ashe motion to substitute proposal of amendment; text
2018-05-09SenatePending third reading, Senator(s) Bray motion to amend proposal of amendment; text
2018-05-09SenateProposal of amendment agreed to
2018-05-09SenatePending third reading, Senator(s) Bray, Campion, MacDonald, and Pearson motion to amend proposal of amendment; text
2018-05-09SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2018-05-08Senate3rd reading ordered
2018-05-08SenateProposal of amendment  by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy, as amended, agreed to
2018-05-08SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy amended as moved by Senator(s) MacDonald, Bray, and Lyons
2018-05-08SenateMotion to substitute amendment agreed to
2018-05-08SenateSenator(s) MacDonald, Bray, and Lyons motion to substitute proposal of amendment; text
2018-05-08SenateProposal of amendment by Senator(s) Rodgers; text
2018-05-08SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Bray for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2018-05-08SenateProposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Rodgers
2018-05-08SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2018-05-08SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2018-05-07SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2018-05-07SenateProposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Rodgers
2018-05-07SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2018-05-05SenateProposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Rodgers
2018-05-05SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2018-05-05SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2018-05-04SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2018-05-04SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-05-04SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2018-02-06SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2018-02-01HousePassed
2018-02-01HouseRead Third time
2018-01-31HouseThird Reading Ordered
2018-01-31HouseRoll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 137, Nays = 4
2018-01-31HouseReport of Committee on Energy and Technology agreed to.
2018-01-31HouseRep. McCormack of Burlington reported for the committee on Energy and Technology
2018-01-31HouseRead Second Time
2017-02-23HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Energy and Technology

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback