VT H0350 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on May 20, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating To The Posting Of Medical Unprofessional Conduct Decisions And To Investigators Of Alleged Unprofessional Conduct

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Relating To The Posting Of Medical Unprofessional Conduct Decisions And To Investigators Of Alleged Unprofessional Conduct

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-10HouseSigned by Governor on May 20, 2014
2014-05-07SenateHouse message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
2014-05-06SenateHouse message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment
2014-05-01HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
2014-04-29HouseSenate message passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment
2014-04-28SenateRead 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2014-04-28SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2014-04-25Senate3rd reading ordered
2014-04-25SenateProposal of amendment agreed to
2014-04-25SenateProposal of amendment by Senator(s) Ayer; text
2014-04-25SenateProposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to
2014-04-25SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Ayer for Committee on Health and Welfare
2014-04-25SenateProposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Ayer
2014-04-25SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2014-04-25SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2014-04-24SenateFavorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2014-02-18SenateCommittee on Government Operations relieved; bill committed to Committee on Health and Welfare on motion of Senator White
2014-01-29SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations
2014-01-24HouseRead Third time and Passed
2014-01-23HouseAmendment of Committee on Health Care agreed to and Third Reading Ordered
2014-01-23HouseRep. Rep. Till of Jericho reported for the committee on Health Care
2014-01-23HouseRead Second Time
2013-03-15HouseRep. Sweaney of Windsor moved to commit bill to the committee on Health Care which was agreed to.
2013-02-22HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback