VT H0294 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 11, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 11, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to inquiries about an applicant’s salary history
Title
An act relating to inquiries about an applicant’s salary history
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Balint, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 137 to Pass -- Yeas = 137, Nays = 0 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 137 to Pass -- Yeas = 137, Nays = 0 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-11 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on May 11, 2018 |
2018-05-11 | House | Signed by Governor on May 11, 2018 |
2018-05-07 | House | Delivered to the Governor on May 7, 2018 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2018-04-24 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2018-04-24 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment considered |
2018-04-19 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator Balint, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-04-17 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs agreed to |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Balint for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2018-04-17 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2018-02-16 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2018-02-15 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-02-15 | House | Report of Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs agreed to. |
2018-02-15 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 69 of 137 to Pass -- Yeas = 137, Nays = 0 |
2018-02-15 | House | Rep. Walz of Barre City reported for the committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs |
2018-02-15 | House | Read Second Time |
2017-02-16 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs |