VT H0290 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 4, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 4, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to clarifying ambiguities relating to real estate titles and conveyances
Title
An act relating to clarifying ambiguities relating to real estate titles and conveyances
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on May 4, 2017 |
2017-05-04 | House | Signed by Governor on May 4, 2017 |
2017-04-13 | House | Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2017-04-11 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Nitka for Committee on Judiciary, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-04-07 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-23 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2017-03-22 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2017-03-22 | House | Report of Committee on Judiciary as amended agreed to |
2017-03-22 | House | Rep. Dickinson of St. Albans Town moved to amend the report of the committee on Judiciary, which was agreed to. |
2017-03-22 | House | Rep. Dickinson of St. Albans Town reported for the committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-22 | House | Read Second Time |
2017-02-16 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary |