VT H0287 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-06 - Signed by Governor on 5/27/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-06 - Signed by Governor on 5/27/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Job Creation, Economic Development, And Buy Local Agriculture
Title
An Act Relating To Job Creation, Economic Development, And Buy Local Agriculture
Sponsors
Rep. William Botzow [D] | Rep. Eileen Dickinson [R] | Rep. Warren Kitzmiller [D] | Rep. Michele Kupersmith [D] |
Rep. Michael Marcotte [R] | Rep. Paul Ralston [D] | Rep. Ernest Shand [D] | Rep. Samuel Young [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-06 | Signed by Governor on 5/27/2011 | |
2011-05-06 | Delivered to the Governor on 5/23/2011 | |
2011-05-06 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2011-05-06 | Committee of Conference report agreed to (House bill) | |
2011-05-06 | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2011-05-05 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-05-05 | Committee of Conference report adopted on roll call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 27, Nays = 1 | |
2011-05-05 | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Ashe for Committee, text | |
2011-05-05 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-05-05 | Committee of Conference Report | |
2011-05-05 | Addendum to Senate calendar | |
2011-05-05 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2011-05-02 | Rules suspended & action messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-05-02 | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Illuzzi, Ashe, and Carris | |
2011-05-02 | House message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed | |
2011-05-02 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2011-05-02 | Speaker appointed Botzow of Pownal, Marcotte of Coventry and Condon of Colchester as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House | |
2011-05-02 | Committee of Conference appointed | |
2011-05-02 | Senate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. Botzow of Pownal | |
2011-05-02 | Rep. Turner of Milton moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration | |
2011-04-29 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-04-29 | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment | |
2011-04-29 | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-04-29 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2011-04-29 | Proposal of amendment agreed to | |
2011-04-29 | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Brock and Ashe; text | |
2011-04-29 | Division of the Senate | |
2011-04-29 | Proposal of amendment not agreed to | |
2011-04-29 | On motion of Senator Kittell, rules suspended to allow consideration of a non-germane amendment | |
2011-04-29 | Point of order sustained by the President | |
2011-04-29 | Point of order raised by Senator Lyons on ground that proposed amendment was not germane | |
2011-04-29 | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Kittell; text | |
2011-04-29 | Division of the Senate | |
2011-04-29 | Proposal of amendment not agreed to | |
2011-04-29 | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Baruth; text | |
2011-04-29 | Proposal of amendment agreed to | |
2011-04-29 | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Galbraith; text | |
2011-04-29 | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs, as amended, agreed to | |
2011-04-29 | Committee on Finance proposal #6 agreed to | |
2011-04-29 | Committee on Finance Proposals #1-#5 and #7-#10 collectively agreed to | |
2011-04-29 | Question on Finance 6th proposal of amendment divided on request of Senator Pollina | |
2011-04-29 | Reported favorably by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-04-29 | Reported favorably by Senator Ashe for Committee on Finance with proposal of amendment | |
2011-04-29 | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Ashe for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs | |
2011-04-29 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-04-29 | Rules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Appropriations with the report of Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs and Finance intact, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-04-29 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-04-19 | Committed to Committee on Finance with report of Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs intact, under suspension of Senate Rule 49, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-04-19 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-04-19 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2011-04-18 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs | |
2011-04-18 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2011-03-23 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs | |
2011-03-18 | Passed | |
2011-03-18 | Rep. Donahue of Northfield, McFaun of Barre Town, and Koch of Barre Town moved to amend the bill which was disagreed to | |
2011-03-18 | Read Third time | |
2011-03-17 | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 68 of 135 to Pass -- Yeas = 122, Nays = 13 | |
2011-03-17 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2011-03-17 | Report of Committee on Commerce and Economic Development as amended agreed to | |
2011-03-17 | Rep. Krebs of South Hero moved to amend the report of the committee on Commerce and Economic Development, which was agreed to. | |
2011-03-17 | Recommendation of Amendment of the Committee on Appropriations agreed to | |
2011-03-17 | Recommendation of Amendment of the Committee on Ways and Means agreed to | |
2011-03-17 | Rep. Manwaring of Wilmington, recommended for the committee on Appropriations | |
2011-03-17 | Rep. Condon of Colchester, recommended for the committee on Ways and Means | |
2011-03-08 | Rep. Rep. Botzow of Pownal reported for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development | |
2011-03-17 | Read Second Time | |
2011-03-15 | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) | |
2011-03-08 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) | |
2011-02-18 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development |