VT H0281 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-7-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Signed by Governor on 6/1/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating To The Removal Of Bodily Remains

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Relating To The Removal Of Bodily Remains

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-12 Signed by Governor on 6/1/2010
2010-05-12 Delivered to the Governor on 5/27/2010
2010-05-12 Rules Suspended and Action on the bill messaged to the Senate forthwith and the bill delivered to the Governor forthwith as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset.
2010-05-12 Committee of Conference report agreed to (House bill)
2010-05-12 Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset
2010-05-12 Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin
2010-05-12 Committee of Conference report adopted
2010-05-12 Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Illuzzi for Committee, text
2010-05-12 Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Shumlin
2010-05-05 Speaker appointed Head of South Burlington, Baker of West Rutland and Ram of Burlington as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House
2010-05-05 Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin
2010-05-05 Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Illuzzi, Carris, and Ashe
2010-05-05 House proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Illuzzi
2010-05-05 House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text
2010-05-05 New Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2010-05-04 House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment
2010-05-03 Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset
2010-05-03 Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Ram of Burlington
2010-04-30 Placed on Calendar for Notice on 4/30/2010
2010-04-29 Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin
2010-04-29 Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2010-04-29 Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Illuzzi agreed to
2010-04-29 Consideration resumed
2010-04-29 Consideration postponed Shall the Senate proposal of amendment be amended as moved by Sen. Illuzzi, before 3rd reading?
2010-04-28 Consideration postponed to next legislative day on motion of Senator Sears
2010-04-28 Pending third reading, Senator(s) Illuzzi motion to amend proposal of amendment; text
2010-04-28 New Business/Third Reading
2010-04-27 3rd reading ordered
2010-04-27 Motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment agreed to
2010-04-27 Senator(s) Illuzzi motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment; text
2010-04-27 Proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs agreed to
2010-04-27 Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Illuzzi for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2010-04-27 Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Illuzzi on behalf of Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2010-04-27 Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2010-04-27 New Business/Second Reading
2010-04-26 Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2010-04-26 Second Reading
2010-02-23 Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs
2010-02-18 Read Third time and Passed
2010-02-18 Amendment as offered by Rep. Donahue of Northfield agreed to
2010-02-18 Rep. Donahue of Northfield moved to amend the bill
2010-02-17 Third Reading Ordered
2010-02-17 Amendment of Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs agreed to
2010-02-17 Read Second Time
2010-02-17 Rep. Ram of Burlington spoke for the committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs
2009-02-24 Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback