VT H0272 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on 5/9/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-05 - Signed by Governor on 5/9/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Maintenance Of Private Roads
Title
An Act Relating To Maintenance Of Private Roads
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-05 | Signed by Governor on 5/9/2012 | |
2012-05-03 | Delivered to the Governor on 5/3/2012 | |
2012-04-25 | Passed the House and Senate on 4/25/2012 | |
2012-04-24 | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence | |
2012-04-24 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2012-04-23 | Reported favorably by Senator Cummings for Committee on Judiciary, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered | |
2012-04-23 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-21 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2012-04-20 | Favorable report by Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-04-20 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2012-03-21 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-03-16 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2012-03-15 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2012-03-15 | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 139 to Pass -- Yeas = 139, Nays = 0 | |
2012-03-15 | Amendment of Committee on Commerce and Economic Development agreed to | |
2012-03-15 | Rep. Kupersmith of South Burlington reported for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development | |
2012-03-15 | Read Second Time | |
2011-05-05 | Rep. Kupersmith of South Burlington moved to commit bill to the committee on Commerce and Economic Development which was agreed to. | |
2011-05-05 | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton | |
2011-02-17 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development |