VT H0270 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on May 28, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on May 28, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Providing Access To Publicly Funded Prekindergarten Education
Title
An Act Relating To Providing Access To Publicly Funded Prekindergarten Education
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Buxton [D] | Rep. Kevin Christie [D] | Rep. George Cross [D] | Rep. Johannah Donovan [D] |
Rep. Peter Peltz [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-02 - Senate - Shall the bill pass in concurrence with proposal of amendment? (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-02 - Senate - Shall the report of the Committee on Appropriation be amended as recommended by Senator Mullin? (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Shall the bill be read the third time? (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - House - Shall the bill be read a third time? (Y: 97 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - House - Shall the bill be amended as recommended by Rep. Buxton of Tunbridge? (Y: 97 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - House - Shall the bill be read a third time? (Y: 97 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - House - Shall the bill be amended as recommended by Rep. Buxton of Tunbridge? (Y: 97 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-05-02 - Senate - Shall the report of the Committee on Appropriation be amended as recommended by Senator Mullin? (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Shall the bill be read the third time? (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - House - Shall the bill be read a third time? (Y: 97 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - House - Shall the bill be amended as recommended by Rep. Buxton of Tunbridge? (Y: 97 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - House - Shall the bill be read a third time? (Y: 97 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - House - Shall the bill be amended as recommended by Rep. Buxton of Tunbridge? (Y: 97 N: 46 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor on May 28, 2014 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2014-05-05 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment on roll call, requested by Senator McAllister, Passed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 19, Nays = 9 |
2014-05-02 | House | Senate message passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2014-05-02 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senator Starr explained vote |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senator Sears explained vote |
2014-05-01 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 1 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) McCormack and Mullin agreed to |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) McCormack and Mullin; text |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Education, as amended, agreed to |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Education amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Senator Galbraith explained vote |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Roll Call, requested by Senator McCormack, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 17, Nays = 13 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations amended as moved by Senator(s) Mullin |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senator(s) Mullin motion to amend Committee on Appropriations proposal of amendment; text |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Starr for Committee on Appropriations with proposal of amendment |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Mullin for Committee on Finance |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Collins for Committee on Education |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Education |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Education |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Education |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Committee on Rules relieved; bill committed to Committee on Education on motion of Senator Campbell |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-05-01 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 95, Nays = 43 |
2013-05-01 | House | Passed |
2013-05-01 | House | Read Third time |
2013-05-01 | House | Rep. Nuovo of Middlebury moved to amend the bill which was agreed to |
2013-04-30 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 97, Nays = 43 |
2013-04-30 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2013-04-30 | House | Amendment of Committee on Education agreed to |
2013-04-30 | House | Amendment as offered by Rep. Browning of Arlington disagreed to |
2013-04-30 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 143 to Pass -- Yeas = 97, Nays = 46 |
2013-04-30 | House | Rep. Buxton of Tunbridge moved to amend the report of the committee on Education, which was agreed to. |
2013-04-30 | House | Report of the Committee on Education amended as recommended by the Committee on Appropriations |
2013-04-30 | House | Report of the Committee on Education amended as recommended by the Committee on Ways and Means |
2013-04-30 | House | Rep. Johnson of South Hero, recommended for the committee on Appropriations |
2013-04-25 | House | Rep. Rep. Greshin of Warren, recommended for the committee on Ways and Means |
2013-04-23 | House | Rep. Rep. Buxton of Tunbridge reported for the committee on Education |
2013-04-30 | House | Read Second Time |
2013-04-26 | House | Action Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Buxton of Tunbridge |
2013-04-25 | House | Action Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Buxton of Tunbridge |
2013-04-24 | House | Action Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Buxton of Tunbridge |
2013-04-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2013-02-14 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Education |