VT H0249 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act related to the Reach Up and Reach Ahead pilot program
Title
An act related to the Reach Up and Reach Ahead pilot program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |
2019-03-26 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2019-03-22 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-03-22 | House | Report of Committee on Human Services as amended agreed to |
2019-03-22 | House | Report of the Committee on Human Services amended as recommended by the Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-22 | House | Rep. Trieber of Rockingham recommended for the committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-22 | House | Rep. Redmond of Essex reported for the committee on Human Services |
2019-03-22 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-03-20 | House | Rep. Ancel of Calais moved that the committee on Ways and Means be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the committee on Appropriations which was agreed to. |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2019-02-15 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Human Services |