VT H0240 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Signed by Governor on 4/28/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Signed by Governor on 4/28/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Continuing To Provide For The Receivership Of Long-term Care Facilities
Title
An Act Relating To Continuing To Provide For The Receivership Of Long-term Care Facilities
Sponsors
Rep. Sandy Haas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | Signed by Governor on 4/28/2011 | |
2011-04-26 | Delivered to the Governor on 4/26/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Passed the House and Senate on 4/19/2011 | |
2011-04-19 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-04-19 | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence | |
2011-04-19 | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Campbell | |
2011-04-19 | Reported favorably by Senator Ayer for Committee on Health and Welfare, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered | |
2011-04-19 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2011-04-18 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2011-04-15 | Favorable report by Committee on Health and Welfare | |
2011-04-15 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2011-03-11 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare | |
2011-03-09 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2011-03-08 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2011-03-08 | Rep. Haas of Rochester reported for the committee on Human Services | |
2011-03-08 | Read Second Time | |
2011-02-15 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Human Services |