VT H0236 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-15 - Signed by Governor on 4/15/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-15 - Signed by Governor on 4/15/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Extending The Limitation Of Prosecutions For Sexual Abuse Of A Vulnerable Adult
Title
An Act Relating To Extending The Limitation Of Prosecutions For Sexual Abuse Of A Vulnerable Adult
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-15 | Signed by Governor on 4/15/2011 | |
2011-04-14 | Delivered to the Governor on 4/14/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in | |
2011-04-06 | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment | |
2011-04-06 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2011-04-05 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2011-04-05 | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to | |
2011-04-05 | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Snelling for Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-04-01 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2011-04-01 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2011-03-31 | Unfinished Business/Second Reading | |
2011-03-30 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2011-03-29 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-03-29 | Entered on Notice Calendar | |
2011-02-22 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2011-02-18 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2011-02-17 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2011-02-17 | Read Second Time | |
2011-02-15 | Placed on Calendar for Notice on 2/15/2011 |